Global Patent Index - EP 1027983 A1

EP 1027983 A1 2000-08-16 - PRESS SCREW

Title (en)

PRESS SCREW

Title (de)

PRESSENSCHRAUBE

Title (fr)

VIS DE PRESSE

Publication

EP 1027983 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928681 A

Priority

  • RU 9800145 W
  • RU 97109958 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856569A2] The present invention relates to press mechanisms for special applications and more precisely to screws for presses used in the extraction of oil from oil-containing raw material. The press screw of the present invention consists in a set of helical, separate and split rings (4, 5, 6, 7, 8) having different outer diameters and a pitch which is equal to that of the turns of the screw. This invention also relates to a method for producing a new screw or for retrofitting a screw worn out during operation, wherein said method uses a set of simple industrial operations that do not require any high-precision equipment nor highly-qualified labour, and essentially eliminate the generation of waste material. The structure of the helical, separate and split rings allows for the production of a screw having any turn or body configuration regardless of the pitch and height of said turns, and whatever the axial distance between the screw turns and the turn overlap values may be. This screw may be used in any screw press or extruding die.

Abstract (de)

Preßschnecke für Preßvorrichtungen für besondere Anwendungen, insbesondere Schneckenpressen zum Ziehen von Öl aus ölhaltigem Rohstoff. Die Preßschnecke ist ausgebildet in Form eines Buchsensatzes aus einzelnen zusammengesetzten geschlitzten Spiralscheiben (4, 5, 6, 7, 8) mit unterschiedlichen Außendurchmessern und einer Ganghöhe, die gleich der Ganghöhe des Schneckengewindes ist. Die Herstellung neuer und die Ausbesserung von im Betrieb verschlissenen Schnecken wird praktisch ohne Metallverluste durch einen Komplex einfachster technologischer Operationen realisiert, die nicht den Einsatz von Geräten mit hoher Präzision und die Ausführung hochqualifizierter Arbeiten erfordern. Die Ausbildung der Schnecke aus einzelnen zusammengesetzten geschlitzten Spiralscheiben ermöglicht die Herstellung der Schnecke in jeder Konfiguration ihres Gewindes und des Körpers, unabhängig von der Gang- und Gewindehöhe sowie unabhängig vom Achsenabstand zwischen dem Schneckengewinde und der Größe der Gewindeüberschneidung. Die Schnecke kann in jeder Schneckenpresse oder einem Extruder eingesetzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/12 (2006.01); B30B 11/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/246 (2013.01); B30B 9/121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856569 A2 19981217; WO 9856569 A3 20000824; AU 8042298 A 19981230; EP 1027983 A1 20000816; EP 1027983 A4 20020626; RU 2112655 C1 19980610

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-06-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020514

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 30B 1/00 A, 7B 30B 9/12 B

2000-10-25 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-10-18 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2000-10-11 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991201

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE