Global patent index - EP 1027990 A1

EP 1027990 A1 2000-08-16 - Ink jet printing head and production method thereof

Title (en)

Ink jet printing head and production method thereof

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldruckkopf und dessen Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Tête d'imprimante à jet d'encre et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1027990 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00102071 A

Priority

JP 2482399 A

Abstract (en)

Protruding portions of thermosetting adhesive 9 at stepped portions of a nozzle communication hole 14 and a nozzle hole 15 are hardened beforehand by ultraviolet ray, so as to suppress flow out of the thermosetting adhesive 9 during heating-hardening. This prevents ink clogging in the supply hole 12, nozzle communication hole 14, nozzle hole 15, enabling a stable ink discharge, and assures air tightness between the respective plates from the nozzle plate 2 to the vibration plate 7. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/14274 (2013.01); B41J 2/161 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14387 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14419 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1027990 A1 20000816; JP 2000218790 A 20000808; JP 3056195 B1 20000626

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: INK JET PRINTING HEAD PRODUCTION METHODS

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI