Global Patent Index - EP 1028001 A1

EP 1028001 A1 2000-08-16 - Organic electroluminescent display panel and method for fabricating the same by thermal transfer

Title (en)

Organic electroluminescent display panel and method for fabricating the same by thermal transfer

Title (de)

Organische Elektrolumineszenzanzeige und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung durch thermische Übertragung

Title (fr)

Panneau d'affichage électroluminescent en matière organique et procédé pour sa fabrication par transfert thermique

Publication

EP 1028001 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00102279 A

Priority

  • EP 97934962 A
  • US 68516196 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a method for patterning an organic electroluminescent material on a substrate, display panel and thermal transfer donor sheet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/38; G03C 7/12; H01J 9/227

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 51/50 (2006.01); B41M 3/06 (2006.01); B41M 5/26 (2006.01); B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B41M 5/385 (2006.01); G03C 7/12 (2006.01); G03F 7/34 (2006.01); H01J 9/227 (2006.01); H01L 51/40 (2006.01); H05B 33/10 (2006.01); H05B 33/12 (2006.01); H05B 33/14 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/395 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/41 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/10 (2013.01); B41M 5/265 (2013.01); B41M 5/38207 (2013.01); B41M 5/385 (2013.01); H01J 9/2277 (2013.01); H01L 51/0013 (2013.01); B41M 5/395 (2013.01); B41M 5/41 (2013.01); B41M 5/508 (2013.01); B41M 5/52 (2013.01); H01L 51/56 (2013.01); Y10S 430/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5998085 A 19991207; AT 196880 T 20001015; AT 264201 T 20040415; AU 3800997 A 19980210; CA 2261109 A1 19980129; DE 69703295 D1 20001116; DE 69703295 T2 20010531; DE 69728696 D1 20040519; DE 69728696 T2 20040812; DK 0914260 T3 20001218; EP 0914260 A1 19990512; EP 0914260 B1 20001011; EP 1028001 A1 20000816; EP 1028001 B1 20040414; ES 2150786 T3 20001201; JP 2000515083 A 20001114; JP 2010280902 A 20101216; KR 100523179 B1 20051024; KR 20000067944 A 20001125; MY 123124 A 20060531; WO 9803346 A1 19980129

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090721

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090721

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-04-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040725

2004-07-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69728696 P 20040519

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0914260 P

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-08-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 914260

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL