Global Patent Index - EP 1028057 A2

EP 1028057 A2 2000-08-16 - Filling station for an aseptic form, fill and sealing packaging machine

Title (en)

Filling station for an aseptic form, fill and sealing packaging machine

Title (de)

Füllstation einer aseptischen Maschine zum Formen, Füllen und Schliessen von Verpackungen

Title (fr)

Station de remplissage pour machine de formage, de remplissage et de scellement d'emballages

Publication

EP 1028057 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101140 A

Priority

DE 19904131 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has an aseptic tunnel with contents conveyor and two filling stations (1,1'). The stations are positioned sealable in adjustable apertures in the tunnel above the contents conveyor, with one station being in working position and the other in cleaning position. The stations are moved between positions by aperture adjustment. Each consists of a two-part moveable unit with a trough section (5) accommodating the filler pipe (3) in cleaning position, and a passage part (6) holding the filler pipe working position. The pipe passage part has a removeable closure cap (8) when the trough section is under the filler pipe.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft Füllstationen für eine Aseptik-FFS-Verpackungsmaschine, deren Packstoffbahn-Förderstrecke (PFS) in einem Aseptiktunnel (2) und hinter deren Packstoff-Formstation (FS) die Füllstation (1) angeordnet ist, die aus mindestens einem in Bezug auf die Förderstrecke (PFS) senkrecht zur Förderstrecke (PFS) verstellbaren Dosierfüllrohr (3) besteht, dem eine Wanne (4) zur Aufnahme von bei der Reinigungsspülung des Füllrohres (3) anfallender Reinigungsflüssigkeit zugeordnet ist. Um eine solche Maschine auch während einer erforderlichen Reinigung weiterlaufen lassen zu können, ist nach der Erfindung vorgesehen, daß am Aseptiktunnel (2) oberhalb der Förderstrecke (PFS) in verstellbaren Öffnungen (2'') abdichtbar zum Tunnel (2) hintereinander zwei Füllstationen (1,1') angeordnet sind, wobei sich abwechselnd jeweils nur eine Füllstation (1,1') in Betriebsstellung und die andere Füllstation (1',1) in Reinigungsstellung befindet. Ferner sind die Füllstationen (1,1') wegen der verstellbaren Öffnungen (2'') zwischen einer Betriebsstellung und einer Reinigungsstellung hin- und herbewegbar und bestehen jeweils aus einem das Füllrohr (3) in Reinigungsstellung aufnehmenden Wannenteil (5) und einem das Füllrohr (3) in Betriebsstellung aufnehmenden Füllrohr-Durchgriffsteil (6). Beide Teile (5,6) bilden dabei zusammen eine bewegbare Einheit und der Füllrohr-Durchgriffsteil (6) ist bei Stellung des Wannenteiles (5) unter dem Füllrohr (3) mit einer abnehmbaren Verschlußkappe (8) versehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 55/02; B65B 39/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 39/12 (2006.01); B65B 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 39/12 (2013.01); B65B 55/025 (2013.01); B65B 2210/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028057 A2 20000816; EP 1028057 A3 20030625; EP 1028057 B1 20060322; DE 19904131 A1 20000824; DE 19904131 C2 20010104; ES 2255902 T3 20060716; US 6179017 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150122

2016-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160226

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150121

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2255902 T3

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2006-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 55/02 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 39/12 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 67C 3/00 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI