Global Patent Index - EP 1028072 A1

EP 1028072 A1 2000-08-16 - Laoding and compacting device for the collecting container of a refuse collecting vehicle

Title (en)

Laoding and compacting device for the collecting container of a refuse collecting vehicle

Title (de)

Belade- und Verdichtungseinrichtung für den Sammelbehälter eines Abfallsammelfahrzeugs

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chargement et de compactage pour le récipient d'un véhicule de ramassage d'ordures

Publication

EP 1028072 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101716 A

Priority

DE 19905986 A

Abstract (en)

The container has a moveable discharge blade, compression blade (5), clearer blade (6), and power bar (11) to pivot the compression blade. The power bar is hinged to the side of the pressure blade away from the intake opening (10) of the container, and to the end of the pivoted stern section (3) in the roof area. In compression position, compression blade and clearer blade are in position parallel to, or on the level of the intake opening. The opening is covered by the blades, and the clearer blade is at an angle of approx. 180 degrees relative to the compression blade.

Abstract (de)

Der Sammelbehälter (2) weist eine heckseitige Einfüllöffnung (10) und ein in dem Sammelbehälter (2) längsverschiebliches Entleerungsschild (14) auf, gegen das der eingefüllte Abfall verdichtet wird. Die Belade- und Verdichtungseinrichtung (4) weist ein heckseitig an dem Sammelbehälter (2) schwenkbar angelenktes Heckteil (3) auf, das im unteren Bereich als Ladewanne (13) ausgebildet ist, des weiteren eine Pressplatte (5), die an ihrem oberen Ende um eine quer zur Fahrzeuglängsrichtung liegende Achse schwenkbar in dem Heckteil (3) in einem Schwenklager (7) gelagert ist, welches parallel zur Ebene der Einfüllöffnung verfahrbar ist, ferner eine Räumplatte (6), die ebenfalls um eine quer zur Fahrzeuglängsrichtung liegende Achse schwenkbar am freien Ende der Pressplatte (5) angelenkt ist, und ein erstes Kraftglied (11) zum Verschwenken der Pressplatte (5). Das erste Kraftglied (11) ist einerseits an der der Einfüllöffnung (10) des Sammelbehälters (2) abgewandten Seite der Pressplatte (5) und andererseits am Ende des Heckteils (3) in dessen Dachbereich angelenkt, wobei die Pressplatte (5) und die zu dieser positionierte Räumplatte (6) in der Presstellung eine Position parallel zur oder in der Ebene der Einfüllöffnung (10) einnehmen, und wobei die Räumplatte (6) in der Presstellung, wenn die Einfüllöffnung (10) durch die Pressplatte (5) und die Räumplatte (6) verschlossen ist, zur Pressplatte (5) einen Winkel von 180° oder annähernd 180° einnimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/207 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028072 A1 20000816; EP 1028072 B1 20040519; AT 267126 T 20040615; DE 19905986 C1 20010104; US 2002136622 A1 20020926; US 6478527 B2 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130418 AND 20130424

2012-12-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ZOLLER-KIPPER GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20121115

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ZOELLER-KIPPER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HALLER UMWELTSYSTEME GMBH & CO., 12277 BERLIN, DE

- Document: DE 50006447

- Effective date: 20120718

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006447

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120718

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006447

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120718

2012-07-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50006447

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041019

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HALLER UMWELTSYSTEME G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HALLER UMWELTSYSTEME G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-27 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050127

2005-01-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050127

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-09-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040830

2004-08-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-08-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-08-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006447 P 20040624

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040519

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021126

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI