Global Patent Index - EP 1028078 A2

EP 1028078 A2 2000-08-16 - Dispenser for flexible wound material

Title (en)

Dispenser for flexible wound material

Title (de)

Handabrollgerät für flexibles Rollenmaterial

Title (fr)

Distributeur pour matériaux flexibles enroulés

Publication

EP 1028078 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100358 A

Priority

DE 29900717 U

Abstract (en)

The winder has a cutter unit which swings out for use on releasing of a safety catch. The catch is moved into its active position by use of a spring which also holds it in place and prevents it from being removed. The swing out unit enables a required length of flexible material to be removed and cut.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung schlägt ein Handhabungsgerät für flexibles Rollenmaterial aus den verschiedenartigsten Werkstoffen vor, bei dem durch ein Federmittel (8c) der Öffnungsmechanismus auf Knopfdruck automatisch in Trennbereitschaft schwingt, und in Verbindung mit einer Zentralspirale (10) die unterschiedlichsten Rolleninnendurchmesser bei gleichem Platzangebot und mehr Rollenmeter aufnehmen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/0026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900717 U1 19991125; EP 1028078 A2 20000816; EP 1028078 A3 20020313

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000801

2003-01-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI