Global patent index - EP 1028080 A3

EP 1028080 A3 2000-11-08 - Method for operating a workstation in a textilmachine for making cross wound bobbins

Title (en)

Method for operating a workstation in a textilmachine for making cross wound bobbins

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Arbeitsstelle einer Kreuzspulen herstellenden Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'un poste de travail d'une machine textile pour la fabrication de bobines à spires croisées

Publication

EP 1028080 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100170 A

Priority

DE 19905860 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1028080A2] To operate a bobbin winding station, to form cross wound bobbins, the workstation computer (32) sets the pressure action (APD) of the yarn brake (114,116) at the yarn tensioner (36) on the yarn (22), according to the measurements from the yarn take-off force sensor (54). The actual pressure force (APDist) is compared with a pressure threshold value (APDmax). If the threshold value is achieved or breached for a given duration, the bobbin winding action is stopped. The yarn brake pressure (APDist) is monitored while the winder workstation (10) is working at the run-up speed after splicing a break, and also at the normal bobbin winding working speed. When the threshold pressure value (APDmax) has been reached or breached, for the set time duration, a controlled yarn cutting action is triggered. A set length of the yarn (22) is retracted from the supply bobbin (14), and cut away. After a successful splicing action, bobbin winding is resumed. The process is repeated at least once and, on again reaching or breaching the pressure threshold value (APDmax) for the set time duration, the winding workstation (10) is shut down. The time duration taken for action on a breach of the pressure threshold value (APDmax) is 1-3 seconds and especially 2 seconds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 63/02; B65H 59/24; B65H 63/036; B65H 69/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/22 (2006.01); B65H 59/24 (2006.01); B65H 63/02 (2006.01); B65H 63/036 (2006.01); B65H 69/00 (2006.01); B65H 69/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/24 (2013.01); B65H 63/02 (2013.01); B65H 63/036 (2013.01); B65H 69/00 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028080 A2 20000816; EP 1028080 A3 20001108; EP 1028080 B1 20031022; DE 19905860 A1 20000817; JP 2000238963 A 20000905; JP 4531906 B2 20100825; TR 200000387 A2 20000921; TR 200000387 A3 20000921; US 6340129 B1 20020122

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCOW

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: LEVERKUSER STRASSE 65, 42897 REMSCHEID (DE)

2014-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER AND PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANW, CH

2014-06-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50004117

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120207

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-10-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040723

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004117

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2003-10-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021219

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI