Global Patent Index - EP 1028083 A1

EP 1028083 A1 2000-08-16 - Hoisting device for the replacement of the anodes in the electrolytic cells for aluminium production

Title (en)

Hoisting device for the replacement of the anodes in the electrolytic cells for aluminium production

Title (de)

Hebevorrichtung zur Ersetzung von Anoden in Elektrolyseöfen für die Aluminium-Herstellung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de levage pour le remplaçement des anodes dans les cuves d'électrolyse pour la production d'aluminium

Publication

EP 1028083 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420036 A

Priority

  • EP 99420036 A
  • CA 2262065 A
  • NO 990725 A

Abstract (en)

The module has two independently motorized lifting components. The first component being designed to assure the displacement of a charge at a relatively important speed and following an extended course. The second component is integrated at the end of one or more cables (13) of the first component. A tool carrying module designed to be put into service in a lifting installation, notably for replacing anodes in the electrolysis cells used for the production of aluminum, comprises two independently motorized lifting components. A first component, made up of a cable lifting system (13) unreeling at the level of an electrically motorized drum (14) and returning at the level of a pulley block (18). The first component being designed to assure the displacement of a charge at a relatively important speed and following an extended course. A second component, of which one of its constituent elements is integrated at the end of one or more cables (13) of the first component after returning to the level of the pulley block (18), and destined, in co-operation with it, to assure the vertical displacement at reduced speed and over a limited course for a more important load.

Abstract (fr)

Ce module porte-outil est destiné à être mis en oeuvre au sein d'une installation de levage, et est notamment destiné à réaliser l'arrachage d'anodes usées au sein d'une installation de production d'aluminium par électrolyse et le transfert desdites anodes et des anodes neuves venant en remplacement de ces dernières. Il est muni de deux organes de levage motorisés de manière indépendante : un premier organe, constitué d'un ensemble de câble(s) (13) venant s'enrouler au niveau de tambour(s) motorisé(s) électriquement (14), et renvoyé(s) au niveau d'un mouflage (18), ledit premier organe étant destiné à assurer le déplacement d'une charge à vitesse relativement importante et selon une course étendue ; un second organe, dont l'un des éléments constitutifs est solidarisé à l'extrémité du ou des câbles (13) dudit premier organe après renvoi au niveau du mouflage (18), et destiné, en coopération avec celui-ci, à assurer le déplacement vertical à vitesse réduite et selon une course limitée d'une charge plus importante, et notamment à effectuer l'arrachage des anodes usées hors des cuves. L'invention concerne également l'installation pour le changement des anodes usées, qui comprend un pont roulant (5), sur lequel se déplace un chariot (6) muni d'un module porte-outils, comportant lui-même un arbre vertical (9) recevant une pluralité de couronnes coaxiales (10, 11, 12), susceptibles d'être mues en rotation indépendamment les unes des autres, chacune desdites couronnes recevant un ou plusieurs modules porte-outils, respectivement destinés : à permettre de rompre la croûte superficielle qui se créée à la surface supérieure du bain d'électrolyse ; à collecter tout ou partie des morceaux provenant de la rupture de ladite croûte ; et à extraire et transférer les anodes usées hors des cuves et à acheminer au niveau desdites cuves des anodes neuves <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 3/04; B66C 17/00; B66D 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 17/00 (2006.01); B66D 3/04 (2006.01); B66D 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 17/00 (2013.01); B66D 3/04 (2013.01); B66D 3/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028083 A1 20000816; EP 1028083 B1 20030702; AU 1528900 A 20000817; AU 761871 B2 20030612; CA 2262065 A1 20000816; CA 2262065 C 20081021; DE 69909230 D1 20030807; NO 320576 B1 20051227; NO 990725 A 20000817; NO 990725 D0 19990216; NZ 502823 A 20010629; SI 1028083 T1 20031031

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203037 T3

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-10-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-10-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909230 P 20030807

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: MK RO SI

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2001-05-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: MK PAYMENT 20010109;RO PAYMENT 20010109;SI PAYMENT 20010109

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI