Global Patent Index - EP 1028157 A1

EP 1028157 A1 2000-08-16 - Process for the treatment and conditioning of rolling oils

Title (en)

Process for the treatment and conditioning of rolling oils

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Aufbereitung und Konditionierung von Walzölen

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement et de conditionnement des huiles de laminage

Publication

EP 1028157 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101035 A

Priority

DE 19905817 A

Abstract (en)

Process for working up and conditioning rolling oil comprises removing dirt and abrasive particles by filtering and with a regulated addition of filter auxiliary aids, and adjusting the electrical conductivity in the purified oil. A flocculating agent is used as the auxiliary aid and is added depending on the residual dirt remaining in the filtrate. A small amount of conductivity caused by the remaining residual dirt remains in the filtrate.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren für die Aufbereitung und die Konditionierung von im Kreislauf gefahrenem Walzöl, bei welchem aus dem zurückgeführten Walzöl durch Filtration und unter geregelter Zufuhr von Filterhilfsmitteln Schmutz- und Abriebpartikel entfernt werden und in dem gereinigten Walzöl eine die elektrostatische Aufladung verhindernde elektrische Leitfähigkeit eingestellt wird. Um bei einem solchen Verfahren auf Leitfähigkeitsadditive verzichten zu können, schlägt die Erfindung vor, daß als Filterhilfsmittel ein Flockungsmittel verwendet wird dessen Zugabemengen in Abhängigkeit von der im Filtrat verbleibenden Restverschmutzung derart geregelt werden, daß im Filtrat eine vorgegebene, durch die verbleibende Restverschmutzung verursachte Mindestleitfähigkeit erhalten bleibt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 175/00; C10M 129/34; C10M 129/42; C10M 129/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 29/01 (2006.01); B01D 35/02 (2006.01); B01D 37/02 (2006.01); B21B 27/10 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01); C10M 175/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 175/0058 (2013.01); C10M 175/0016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 5032303 A 19910716 - BONDPAE ULF [SE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028157 A1 20000816; EP 1028157 B1 20050525; DE 19905817 A1 20000831; DE 19905817 C2 20030618; JP 2000237814 A 20000905; US 6358423 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010368 P 20050630

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010307

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI