Global Patent Index - EP 1028170 A1

EP 1028170 A1 2000-08-16 - HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR

Publication

EP 1028170 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944299 A

Priority

  • JP 9804375 W
  • JP 26608397 A

Abstract (en)

A heat exchanger (1) has tubes (2) and fins (3) alternately stacked and ends of the tubes inserted into and connected to header pipes (4); wherein the tubes (2) are formed of a flat tube material by roll molding or press molding, a tube material for forming the tubes (2) has an aluminum alloy of Al-Mn-based one or the like as a core material and an Al-Zn-based aluminum alloy not containing Si clad on a layer to be the outer surface of the tube, so to improve pitting corrosion resistance of the tubes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/00; B23K 1/00; B23K 1/19; F28F 21/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/00 (2006.01); F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28F 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 19/06 (2013.01); F28D 1/0391 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916920 A1 19990408; EP 1028170 A1 20000816; EP 1028170 A4 20020619; JP H11106855 A 19990420

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100401

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070816

2002-06-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020507

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 22C 21/00 A, 7F 28F 21/08 B, 7B 23K 1/00 B, 7B 23K 1/19 B, 7F 28F 19/06 B

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZEXEL VALEO CLIMATE CONTROL CORPORATION

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB