Global Patent Index - EP 1028177 A1

EP 1028177 A1 2000-08-16 - Passivating process

Title (en)

Passivating process

Title (de)

Passivierungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé de passivation

Publication

EP 1028177 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102696 A

Priority

DE 19905134 A

Abstract (en)

A method for passivating electroplated zinc-nickel coatings involves treating the coating with an oxidising agent. An Independent claim is also included for a coating system with an oxidatively treated Zn or Zn alloy coating, especially a Zn-Ni coating.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Passivierung von galvanischen Zink-Nickel-Überzügen, bei dem der Überzug mit einem Oxidationsmittel behandelt wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 22/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/53 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/53 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0760401 A1 19970305 - DIPSOL CHEM [JP]
  • [Y] GB 2261617 A 19930526 - DOERKEN EWALD AG [DE]
  • [X] GB 2097024 A 19821027 - HOOKER CHEMICALS PLASTICS CORP
  • [X] US 4331487 A 19820525 - MIRRA MICHAEL J, et al
  • [X] US 5393354 A 19950228 - BISHOP CRAIG V [US]
  • [A] EP 0317684 A1 19890531 - PROCOAT SA [ES]
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 121, no. 6, 8 August 1994, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 62348v, EL-SHARIF M. R.: "Sudies of chemical conversion treatments of electrodeposited zinc-chromium or zinc-nickel-chromium" XP000665390 & INTERN. CORROSION CONGRESS NACE, vol. 12, no. 1, 1993, Houston, pages 329 - 340INTERN. CORROSION CONGRESS NACEHouston1993121329340
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 05 30 June 1995 (1995-06-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 474 (M - 1668) 5 September 1994 (1994-09-05)
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198432, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A82, AN 1984-197561, XP002138169
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 033 (C - 472) 30 January 1988 (1988-01-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 271 (C - 311) 29 October 1985 (1985-10-29)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 007 (C - 673) 10 January 1990 (1990-01-10)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 085 (C - 410) 14 March 1987 (1987-03-14)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 221 (C - 598) 23 May 1989 (1989-05-23)
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199420, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M14, AN 1994-165770, XP002125199
  • [X] WHARTON J A ET AL: "NON-CHROMATE CONVERSION COATING TREATMENTS FOR ELECTRODEPOSITED ZINC-NICKEL ALLOYS", TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF METAL FINISHING,GB,INSTITUTE OF METAL FINISHING. LONDON, vol. 74, no. PART 06, pages 210-213 - 213, XP000635797, ISSN: 0020-2967

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028177 A1 20000816; DE 19905134 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010511

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI