Global patent index - EP 1028179 A1

EP 1028179 A1 2000-08-16 - Electrolyzer with partial emptying of the electrolyte

Title (en)

Electrolyzer with partial emptying of the electrolyte

Title (de)

Elektrolyseur mit Teilentleerung des Elektrolyten

Title (fr)

Electrolyseur avec vidange partielle de l'électrolyte

Publication

EP 1028179 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102682 A

Priority

DE 19905565 A

Abstract (en)

Electrolyzer has several electrolysis cells (3) injected with electrolyte via a main channel (1) and a supply channel (2). The main channel and/or the supply channel are arranged in sections above the cells. An Independent claim is also included for a process for operating an electrolyzer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Elektrolyseurs mit mehreren hintereinander geschalteten Elektrolysezellen. Die Elektrolysezellen werden über wenigstens einen Hauptkanal (1) und einen Versorgungskanal (2) mit einem Elektrolyten versorgt. Während Betriebspausen wird der Elektrolyt teilweise entleert, so daß der Elektrolyt in den Elektrolysezellen verbleibt und der Hauptkanal und/oder die Versorgungskanäle zumindest teilweise entleert sind. Parasitäre Ströme werden so minimiert und Leistungsverluste vermieden. Vorteilhaft sind bei einem Elektrolyseur zur Durchführung des Verfahrens Elektrolytkanäle (1) zumindest teilweise oberhalb der Elektrolysezellen angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25B 9/00; C25B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25B 9/20 (2006.01); C25B 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25B 9/203 (2013.01); C25B 15/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028179 A1 20000816; DE 19905565 A1 20000817

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030803

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010126

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI