Global Patent Index - EP 1028182 A1

EP 1028182 A1 2000-08-16 - Composite yarn and method of manufacturing same

Title (en)

Composite yarn and method of manufacturing same

Title (de)

Verbundgarn und verfahren zur dessen herstellung

Title (fr)

Fils composites et sa methode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1028182 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00102785 A

Priority

JP 3418299 A

Abstract (en)

A composite yarn and a method at manufacturing same are disclosed which make it possible to produce a fine spun twisted union yarn (33) with natural grandrelle-like patterns. In particular, a manufacturing method of a fine spun twisted union yarn (33) is disclosed where the feed rate or feeding time of one of two fiber bundles (321, 322) is varied according to a 1/f fluctuation, and the one fiber bundle is spun and twisted with the other fiber bundle, so that the one fiber bundle appears and disappears alternately on the periphery of the spun twisted union yarn (33). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/36; D02G 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/36 (2006.01); D02G 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/36 (2013.01); D02G 3/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028182 A1 20000816; CN 1263175 A 20000816; US 2002152738 A1 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-01-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021004

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH ES GB IT LI

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH ES GB IT LI

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI