Global patent index - EP 1028184 A1

EP 1028184 A1 2000-08-16 - Weft insertion apparatus and rapier band for rapier loom

Title (en)

Weft insertion apparatus and rapier band for rapier loom

Title (de)

Schusseintragsvorrichtung und Eintragsband für Greiferwebmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'insertion de la trame et ruban d'insertion pour métiers à tisser à griffes

Publication

EP 1028184 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00101649 A

Priority

JP 3134699 A

Abstract (en)

A highly abrasion-resistant rapier band having a high bending rigidity across the width direction thereof even after abrasion, and a long life is provided. The rapier band (12) has a laminated structure including a core member (28) and a pair of woven fabrics for preventing abrasion (19, 20). The woven fabrics for preventing abrasion (19, 20) are of satin weave consisting of warp threads (T) and weft threads (Y). A reinforcing compensation layer (t1) made of fibers for compensating for the bending rigidity across the width direction of the rapier band (12) lies beneath each woven fabric for preventing abrasion (19, 20), with the surface of the reinforcing compensation layer (t1) away from the center (S1) of the thickness (S) of the rapier band (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/27 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/272 (2013.01); D03D 47/276 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028184 A1 20000816; EP 1028184 B1 20040623

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI K.K.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-04-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050324

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE IT

2004-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KIMBARA, MASAHIKO

2004-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TSUZUKI, MAKOTO

2004-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YASUE, MASAHIKO

2004-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NIIDA, EIKI

2003-02-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021120

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE IT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI