Global patent index - EP 1028185 A1

EP 1028185 A1 2000-08-16 - Transfer needle for stitch transfer

Title (en)

Transfer needle for stitch transfer

Title (de)

Umhängenadel zur Maschenübertragung

Title (fr)

Aiguille de transfert pour le transfert de maille

Publication

EP 1028185 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121389 A

Priority

DE 19905668 A

Abstract (en)

The loop transfer needle, for a knitter, has a shaft (2) with a guide surface (29). A section (34) of the guide surface (29), at the needle side surface (12), forms an obtuse angle with a section (31) against the needle back (6), open towards the loop transfer spring (15). The recess (11) gives a gap between the needle back (6) and the facing upper side of the needle for a stitch support edge (14) between the upper side and the side surface (12). The guide surface (29) has a curvature in relation to the longitudinal line of the needle, at least partially on a line (V) at right angles to the longitudinal line of the needle from the needle back (6) to the upper side. The curvature is a circular arc or a parabola. The guide surface (29) has at least one kink line (33), preferably along the longitudinal direction. The guide surface (29) at the needle back (6) forms an angle with the lateral direction (V) of 20 degrees . The guide surface (29) forms an angle at the side surface (12) with the direction (V) of 20 degrees or 25 degrees and preferably 30 degrees . The recess (11) at the needle back (6) takes up more than half the width of the loop transfer needle. The kink line (33) acts as the transit between two angled zones of the guide surface (29), generally at the level of the lower edge (32) of the loop transfer spring (15).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Umhängenadel ist im Schaft (2) eine Ausnehmung (11) vorgesehen, die von einer Umhängefeder (15) überdeckt wird. Die Ausnehmung legt eine Führungsfläche (29) fest, die mit der Umhängefeder (15) einen Einstechraum (27) für eine eindringende oder einstechende Umhängenadel (1') zur Maschenübernahme festlegt. Die Führungsfläche (29) ist in wenigstens zwei Flächenbereiche (31, 34) unterteilt, die miteinander einen stumpfen, sich zu der Umhängefeder (15) hin öffnenden Winkel einschließen. Die einzelnen Flächenbereiche (31, 34) können für sich jeweils plan oder gewölbt ausgebildet sein. Insgesamt ergibt sich eine konkave Gestaltung der Führungsfläche, was die dynamischen Belastungen der Umhängefeder (15) reduziert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/04 (2006.01); D04B 7/00 (2006.01); D04B 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028185 A1 20000816; EP 1028185 B1 20040707; DE 19905668 A1 20000817; DE 19905668 C2 20010125; ES 2219978 T3 20041201; JP 2000234248 A 20000829; JP 4369000 B2 20091118; US 6298693 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121028

2014-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140116

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121027

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121027

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121027

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909904

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111026

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-01-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2219978

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909904

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020930

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI