Global Patent Index - EP 1028188 A2

EP 1028188 A2 2000-08-16 - Assembly for at least two , set up together and programme controlled , household apparatus

Title (en)

Assembly for at least two , set up together and programme controlled , household apparatus

Title (de)

Bausatz von mindestens zwei miteinander aufzustellenden, programmgesteuerten Haushaltgeräten

Title (fr)

Assemblage pour au moins deux appareils domestiques mis ensemble et commandés par programme

Publication

EP 1028188 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101672 A

Priority

DE 19905742 A

Abstract (en)

The appliances (1,2) located on top of each other, are connected through interfaces (3,4). The appliances (1,2) are program-controlled units which execute successive processes on the same objects, eg. a washing machine (1) and a dryer (2).

Abstract (de)

Insbesondere eine Waschmaschine und ein darüber aufgestellter Wäschetrockner sind mit einem Datenbuskanal (Schnittstellen 3 und 4) untereinander verbindbar. Daher muß der Wäschetrockner nicht unbedingt ein eigenes Steuergerät aufweisen; zumindest können aber seiner Steuerung Daten über den gerade behandelten Wäscheposten vom Steuergerät der Waschmaschine übermittelt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 29/02; D06F 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 29/00 (2006.01); D06F 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 29/005 (2013.01); D06F 29/00 (2013.01); D06F 33/02 (2013.01); D06F 2210/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028188 A2 20000816; EP 1028188 A3 20020417; DE 19905742 A1 20000817; DE 19905742 B4 20100107

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041221

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI