Global patent index - EP 1028189 A2

EP 1028189 A2 2000-08-16 - Laundry washing machine with a drum having a structured surface

Title (en)

Laundry washing machine with a drum having a structured surface

Title (de)

Trommelwaschmaschine mit einer Wäschetrommel, deren Trommelmantel eine strukturierte Oberfläche aufweist

Title (fr)

Machine à laver le linge avec tambour à surface structurée

Publication

EP 1028189 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101279 A

Priority

DE 19905534 A

Abstract (en)

The clear width of the ducts (9) is smaller than that of the raised sections (7) at the height of the inner drum surface. The drum (1) is cylindrical or conical and the openings (5) for the washing solution are distributed evenly in the indentations (9).

Abstract (de)

Die Wäschetrommel 1 weist wenigstens einen Trommelmantel 3 auf, in dem Durchtrittsöffnungen 5 für die Waschlauge und Erhöhungen 7 ausgebildet sind, die sich mit Vertiefungen 9 abwechseln, wobei die Vertiefungen 9 als relativ enge Kanäle ausgebildet sind, deren Breite deutlich geringer ist als die Breite der Erhöhungen 7. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028189 A2 20000816; EP 1028189 A3 20010816; DE 19905534 A1 20000817; DE 19905534 B4 20100204

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031216

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20020218

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020218

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI