Global patent index - EP 1028200 A2

EP 1028200 A2 2000-08-16 - Outlet valve

Title (en)

Outlet valve

Title (de)

Ablaufventil

Title (fr)

Soupape d'échappement

Publication

EP 1028200 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101119 A

Priority

DE 19905816 A

Abstract (en)

The drain valve returns into its closing position after an opening process and at least partial emptying of the water. The valve outlet (1) is formed in a pipe (10), which has a height-adjustable section within the water. In closing position, the outlet is held by a float (3) above the water level (20). There is a device to lower the float, which consists of a ring around the outlet. The pipe is connected to the outlet area of the cistern (2) via a roll membrane (12) or a folded diaphragm.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Ablaufventil für einen Flüssigkeitsbehälter, insbesondere für einen Toilettenspülkasten, mit einer Auslassöffnung, wobei das Ablaufventil nach dem Öffnungsvorgang und wenigstens einer Teilentleerung der Flüssigkeit in seine Schliessstellung zurückkehrt, ist vorgeschlagen, dass die Auslassöffnung des Ablaufventils an einem in seiner in den Flüssigkeitsbehälter vorstehenden Höhe beweglichen Rohr ausgebildet ist, wobei in der Verschlussstellung die Auslassöffnung des Rohrs von einem Schwimmer oberhalb des Flüssigkeitsspiegels gehalten ist, und dass eine Vorrichtung vorgesehen ist, mit der der Schwimmer versenkbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/35 (2006.01); B65D 47/20 (2006.01); E03D 1/14 (2006.01); E03D 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/34 (2013.01); E03D 1/142 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028200 A2 20000816; EP 1028200 A3 20001108; DE 19905816 A1 20000817; JP 2000234369 A 20000829; US 2001016959 A1 20010830; US 6199221 B1 20010313; US 6381764 B2 20020507

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040413

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROHEDAL SANITAERSYSTEME GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROHEDAL GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010403

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI