Global Patent Index - EP 1028203 A2

EP 1028203 A2 2000-08-16 - Reinforcing system

Title (en)

Reinforcing system

Title (de)

Bewehrungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'armature

Publication

EP 1028203 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00101468 A

Priority

DE 29902384 U

Abstract (en)

The reinforcement (6-9) comprises two plate-shaped (3a,b) finished concrete parts (1,2) and site concrete surrounded reinforcement rods which grip the plate edges. Between the top surface parts are a plate edge and finished parts with an edge for the reinforced parts. The carrying handle of a finished parts runs along the handle neighboring part.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Verbundbewehrung zwischen mindestens zwei aneinanderstoßenden plattenförmigen Stahlbetonfertigteilen und Ortbeton, bei welcher vom Ortbeton umhüllte Bewehrungsstäbe an den Plattenrändern teilweise einander übergreifen und in den Ortbeton verlaufend gebogen sind, wobei die über den Plattenrand abstehenden Abschnitte der Bewehrungsstäbe unter einem flachen Winkel aus der Bewehrungsebene gebogen sind und den an den Plattenrand sich anschließenden, im wesentlichen flachen Oberflächenbereich des benachbarten Fertigteils übergreifen, lassen sich dadurch ohne nennenswerte nachträgliche Bewehrungsergänzung, Biegezugkräfte über Bauteilfugen übertragen bzw. im Fugenbereich eine zuverlässige Übertragung von Zwangszugspannungen gewährleisten, daß die überstehenden Abschnitte der Bewehrungsstäbe als Schlaufen ausgebildet sind und die Schlaufen in einer gemeinsamen Ebene liegen, die unter einem flachen Winkel zur Bewehrungsebene verläuft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/16; E04B 2/86; E04B 5/06; E04B 5/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/86 (2006.01); E04B 5/06 (2006.01); E04B 5/38 (2006.01); E04C 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/16 (2013.01); E04B 2/8617 (2013.01); E04B 5/06 (2013.01); E04B 5/38 (2013.01); E04B 2002/867 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028203 A2 20000816; EP 1028203 A3 20010502; DE 29902384 U1 20000720

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040219

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010829

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 5/16 A, 7E 04B 5/06 B, 7E 04B 5/38 B, 7E 04B 2/86 B, 7E 04B 5/02 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI