Global Patent Index - EP 1028204 A2

EP 1028204 A2 2000-08-16 - Tile retaining storm hook

Title (en)

Tile retaining storm hook

Title (de)

Sturmklammer für Dachziegel

Title (fr)

Crochet de retenue de tuile

Publication

EP 1028204 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99126100 A

Priority

DE 29902345 U

Abstract (en)

The anchoring section (30) holds the first end of the clip (20) to the tiling batten (2). The central region (24) grips (28) towards the fastening section. This holds the upper edge of the first tile (4) down onto the batten. The end of the clip is turned back, to hold down the lower edge of the second tile (6) over the first.

Abstract (de)

Sturmklammer in gebogener, länglicher Form für Dachziegel, insbesondere für Preßfalz-Ziegel, zur Verbindung zwischen einer Traglatte und einem Randabschnitt mindestens eines Ziegels, gekennzeichnet durch einen Verankerungsabschnitt am ersten Ende der Sturmklammer zur Verankerung der Sturmklammer an einer Traglatte, einen ersten Klemmabschnitt im mittleren Bereich der Sturmklammer mit mindestens einer Klemmfläche, deren Oberfläche in Richtung des Verankerungsabschnittes ausgerichtet ist, zur Klemmung eines oberen Randabschnittes eines ersten Ziegels auf der Traglatte und einen zweiten Klemmabschnitt am zweiten Ende der Sturmklammer mit einer Klemmfläche, deren Oberfläche in Richtung des ersten Klemmabschnittes und des Verankerungsabschnittes ausgerichtet ist, zur Klemmung eines unteren Randabschnittes eines auf den ersten Ziegel gedeckten zweiten Ziegels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/34 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3411 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3414 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3417 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3458 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3482 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902345 U1 19990422; EP 1028204 A2 20000816; EP 1028204 A3 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04D 1/34 A, 7E 04D 13/10 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI