Global Patent Index - EP 1028204 A3

EP 1028204 A3 2000-11-08 - Tile retaining storm hook

Title (en)

Tile retaining storm hook

Title (de)

Sturmklammer für Dachziegel

Title (fr)

Crochet de retenue de tuile

Publication

EP 1028204 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99126100 A

Priority

DE 29902345 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1028204A2] The anchoring section (30) holds the first end of the clip (20) to the tiling batten (2). The central region (24) grips (28) towards the fastening section. This holds the upper edge of the first tile (4) down onto the batten. The end of the clip is turned back, to hold down the lower edge of the second tile (6) over the first.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/34; E04D 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/34 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3411 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3414 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3417 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3458 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3482 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902345 U1 19990422; EP 1028204 A2 20000816; EP 1028204 A3 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04D 1/34 A, 7E 04D 13/10 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI