Global Patent Index - EP 1028214 A2

EP 1028214 A2 2000-08-16 - Sliding door system

Title (en)

Sliding door system

Title (de)

Schiebetüranordnung

Title (fr)

Système de porte coulissante

Publication

EP 1028214 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250037 A

Priority

DE 19905272 A

Abstract (en)

The sliding door assembly has an upper guide rail (3) in the wall opening, for the rollers at the top of the suspended sliding door. The rail (3) is inserted into a pocket in the brickwork. The sliding movement of the door is defined by stoppers (8) at the ends of the rail (3), linked together rigidly by at least one connector (9,10), which slides horizontally in the rail (3). The stopper (8) to block the sliding movement is locked to the rail (3). When the stopper (8) is released, it can slide together with the other stopper and, if required, widen to door opening.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schiebetüranordnung, bei der die Schiebetür (1) mit ihrem oberen Ende mittels Rollen (2) in einer oben in der Wandöffnung angebrachten Schiene (3) aufgehängt ist und in eine Tasche (4) im Mauerwerk einschiebbar ist, wobei die verschiebebewegung durch zwei an der Schiene (3) in der Nähe ihrer Enden angebrachte Stopper (7, 8) begrenzt wird. Die Stopper sind durch wenigstens ein Verbindungselement (9, 10) miteinander starr verbunden und in der Schiene (3) in horizontaler Richtung verschiebbar gelagert, wobei der die Schließbewegung begrenzende Stopper (8) an der Schiene (3) arretierbar ist. Durch Lösen der Arretierung des Stoppers (8) kann dieser zusammen mit dem Stopper (7) verschoben und damit im Bedarfsfall die Türöffnung verbreitert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 13/00; E05F 5/00; E06B 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/60 (2006.01); E05F 5/00 (2006.01); E06B 3/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/4654 (2013.01); E05D 13/04 (2013.01); E05F 5/003 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/224 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/686 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/12 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/20 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/312 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/205 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/21 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/746 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028214 A2 20000816; EP 1028214 A3 20030528; DE 19905272 C1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031129

2004-03-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-02-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI