Global patent index - EP 1028215 A2

EP 1028215 A2 2000-08-16 - Safety unlocking device for the disconnection of a controlled up and over door from its drive

Title (en)

Safety unlocking device for the disconnection of a controlled up and over door from its drive

Title (de)

Sichereitsentriegelungsvorrichtung zum Abkuppeln eines durch ein Antriebsaggregat antreibbaren Torblatts vom Antriebsaggregat

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déverrouillage de sécurité pour le débrayage d'une porte basculante motorisée de son entraînement

Publication

EP 1028215 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102440 A

Priority

DE 29902271 U

Abstract (en)

The security release system for a locked door (10), which has a drive for its opening and closing actions, has a release mechanism (22) at the door frame body (70) to disengage the door from the drive. An operating unit (24) is at the door panel (10), for the release action, and especially as a handle. The release handle has a grip (24) so that, when it is moved, the inner end (34) of the handle trips the release mechanism (22) to disengage the door from its drive. The release action can only be executed when the door is in a particular position, and pref. when closed.

Abstract (de)

Für eine einfachere und schnellere Betätigung einer Sicherheitsentriegelungsvorrichtung zum Abkuppeln eines durch ein Antriebsaggregat antreibbaren Torblattes (10) vom Antriebsaggregat, welche ein Abkuppeln nur in einer bestimmten Stellung - vorzugsweise der Schließstellung des Torblattes (10) - zulässt, wird das Vorsehen eines ortsfest im Bereich der Zarge (70) befestigten Auslösemechanismusses (22) zum Auslösen des Abkuppelvorganges und einer am Torblatt (10) befestigten Erfassungseinrichtung (24) vorgeschlagen, an der das Torblatt (10) - insbesondere durch Handeingriff - erfassbar und im abgekuppelten Zustand aus der bestimmten Stellung bewegbar ist und die eine Eingriffsausbildung (32) für den Eingriff mit dem Auslösemechanismus (22) aufweist, welche Eingriffsausbildung (32) mittels der Erfassungseinrichtung (24) derart verlagerbar ist, dass sie über den Eingriff mit dem Auslösemechanismus (22) diesen zum Auslösen des Abkuppelvorganges betätigt. Dabei sind die dem Torblatt zugeordnete Eingriffsausbildungen (32) und der der Zarge (70) zugeordnete Auslösemechanismus (22) derart angeordnet, dass sie nur dann, wenn das Torblatt (10) in der bestimmten Stellung ist, in Eingriff bringbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/10 (2006.01); E05F 15/16 (2006.01); E05D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/603 (2013.01); E05F 15/668 (2013.01); E05D 13/003 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/244 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/11 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/116 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028215 A2 20000816; EP 1028215 A3 20011219; DE 29902271 U1 20000810; PL 338292 A1 20000814

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-10-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI