Global Patent Index - EP 1028215 A3

EP 1028215 A3 2001-12-19 - Safety unlocking device for the disconnection of a controlled up and over door from its drive

Title (en)

Safety unlocking device for the disconnection of a controlled up and over door from its drive

Title (de)

Sichereitsentriegelungsvorrichtung zum Abkuppeln eines durch ein Antriebsaggregat antreibbaren Torblatts vom Antriebsaggregat

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déverrouillage de sécurité pour le débrayage d'une porte basculante motorisée de son entraînement

Publication

EP 1028215 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102440 A

Priority

DE 29902271 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1028215A2] The security release system for a locked door (10), which has a drive for its opening and closing actions, has a release mechanism (22) at the door frame body (70) to disengage the door from the drive. An operating unit (24) is at the door panel (10), for the release action, and especially as a handle. The release handle has a grip (24) so that, when it is moved, the inner end (34) of the handle trips the release mechanism (22) to disengage the door from its drive. The release action can only be executed when the door is in a particular position, and pref. when closed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/603 (2015.01); E05F 15/668 (2015.01); E05D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/603 (2013.01); E05F 15/668 (2013.01); E05D 13/003 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/244 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/11 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/116 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028215 A2 20000816; EP 1028215 A3 20011219; DE 29902271 U1 20000810; PL 338292 A1 20000814

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-10-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI