Global Patent Index - EP 1028216 A2

EP 1028216 A2 2000-08-16 - Locker system

Title (en)

Locker system

Title (de)

Schliessfachsystem

Title (fr)

Système de compartiments verrouillables

Publication

EP 1028216 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00200218 A

Priority

NL 1011256 A

Abstract (en)

A locker system has a number of individual locking compartments each having a lockable door and comprises a frame construction, the locking compartments being connectable to this frame construction. The frame construction can be releasable connected to a fixed box structure, and the compartments can be fixed to the frame construction in such a way that an accessible outer wall of the locker system is formed which is substantially covered by the lockable doors of the compartments. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05G 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028216 A2 20000816; EP 1028216 A3 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05G 1/08 A, 7A 47B 87/02 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI