Global patent index - EP 1028220 A2

EP 1028220 A2 2000-08-16 - See Through type folding shutter

Title (en)

See Through type folding shutter

Title (de)

Transparenter Faltvorhang

Title (fr)

Store en accordéon transparent

Publication

EP 1028220 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300982 A

Priority

JP 3122599 A

Abstract (en)

A shutter main body 1 is constructed so as to be stretchable and see-through by folding a plurality of crosspieces 2 by a stretching link mechanism 4, said plural crosspieces 2 being provided with a link element 9 so as to stride across the plural crosspieces 2, said link element 9 being moved cooperatively with the stretching link mechanism 4 by apportioning pivotal support and slide toward the crosspiece 2 so as to be folded between the plurality of crosspieces 2, said shutter main body 1 being provided with a decoration-expressing link mechanism 8 indicating a type of business by combination with the link element 9. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/262

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/06 (2006.01); G09F 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/063 (2013.01); E06B 9/0661 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028220 A2 20000816; EP 1028220 A3 20030212; CN 1171002 C 20041013; CN 1266141 A 20000913; JP 2000230377 A 20000822; JP 4005253 B2 20071107

INPADOC legal status

2009-02-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080901

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-05-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SEE THROUGH TYPE FOLDING SHUTTER

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/262 A

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/06 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI