Global Patent Index - EP 1028224 A2

EP 1028224 A2 2000-08-16 - Roller shutter with automatic locking in closing position

Title (en)

Roller shutter with automatic locking in closing position

Title (de)

Rolladen mit automatischer Verriegelung in Schliessstellung

Title (fr)

Volet roulant avec verrouillage automatique en position fermée

Publication

EP 1028224 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202564 A

Priority

IL 12846999 A

Abstract (en)

Roller shutter comprising a roller gate (1), a revolving axle (2) to which the roller gate (1) is connected by chain connection means (5) which allow the winding of the roller gate (1) about the revolving axle (4), and an electric motor (40) or other means to control the rotation of the revolving axle (4). The chain connection means (5) are formed by segments (9, 13) which are hingedly connected to rotate with respect to each other of a very little angle and braking means (41) for the revolving axle are provided which co-operate with the chain connection means (5) in order to prevent a lifting of the roller shutter (1) by forces acting from the bottom. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/86; E06B 9/171

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/171 (2006.01); E06B 9/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/86 (2013.01); E06B 9/171 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028224 A2 20000816; EP 1028224 A3 20020925; AU 1012800 A 20000817; IL 128469 D0 20000131

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1030252

2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI