Global Patent Index - EP 1028226 A2

EP 1028226 A2 2000-08-16 - Method and device for constructing an underground tunnel

Title (en)

Method and device for constructing an underground tunnel

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines unterirdischen Tunnels

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour la construction d'un tunnel souterrain

Publication

EP 1028226 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00200339 A

Priority

NL 1011296 A

Abstract (en)

In a method and device for constructing a tunnel in the ground along a predetermined path, a rod is positioned in the ground. The rod is fixed with respect to the ground at at least one location. An earth removing device is displaced along the rod for the purpose of constructing the tunnel. A drive device which acts on the rod and the earth removing device is provided for the purpose of supplying at least part of the force for displacing the earth removing device. Tunnel wall sections are displaced along the rod with the aid of a second drive device which acts on the rod and the tunnel wall sections. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/28; E21D 9/00; E21D 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/04 (2006.01); E21B 7/28 (2006.01); E21D 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/0621 (2013.01); E21B 7/046 (2013.01); E21B 7/28 (2013.01); E21D 9/0607 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028226 A2 20000816; EP 1028226 A3 20020904; NL 1011296 C1 20000815

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060328

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050411

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEEREMA HOLDING CONSTRUCTION INC.

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI