Global Patent Index - EP 1028283 A2

EP 1028283 A2 2000-08-16 - Improved metal foam containers

Title (en)

Improved metal foam containers

Title (de)

Verbesserter Behälter aus Metallschaum

Title (fr)

Récipient amélioré en mousse métallique

Publication

EP 1028283 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300802 A

Priority

GB 9902925 A

Abstract (en)

A gas container made from metal foam material comprising at least one extraction tube a portion of which extends into the container said portion being formed with a plurality of perforations. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 1/00 (2006.01); F17C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 11/00 (2013.01); F17C 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028283 A2 20000816; EP 1028283 A3 20010606; GB 9902925 D0 19990331

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 17C 1/08 A, 7F 17C 11/00 B, 7F 17C 1/14 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI