Global patent index - EP 1028286 A2

EP 1028286 A2 2000-08-16 - Cooking plate for gas ranges

Title (en)

Cooking plate for gas ranges

Title (de)

Kochstelle für Gasherde

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson pour cuisinières à gaz

Publication

EP 1028286 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120745 A

Priority

DE 19905198 A

Abstract (en)

The burner is operated by a primary air mixture through two superposed gas air mixture supply chambers (1) which provide a main and preferably holding flame and an extremely low simmer flame through a gas input attached to the lower side of the burner head (6). The upper burner ring (3) of the upper gas air mixture supply chamber has on its outer diameter gas outlets (7) to produce the main and holding flame whilst the second burner ring (4) under the upper ring has on its outer diameter a split like circular gas outlet for the burner head producing the simmer flame. The two external diameters of the burner rings have the same size in the flame area.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kochstelle für Gasherde, deren Brenner mit Primärluftvormischung betrieben wird, bestehend aus zwei übereinander angeordneten Gasluftgemisch-Versorgungskammern (1,2), die beide durch einen an der Brennerkopfunterseite angebrachten, jeweils getrennten Gaseingang (1a,2a) mit einer Gasluftmisch-Einrichtung zur Bildung des Gasluftgemisches für eine Haupt- und vorzugsweise Halteflamme, und für eine extrem niedrige Simmerflamme sorgen. Der obere Brennerring (3) der oberen Gasluftgemisch-Versorgungskammer (1) weist an seinem äußeren Durchmesser Gasaustrittsöffnugen (7) auf, die die Haupt- und vorzugsweise Halteflamme erzeugen, und der unter dem oberen Brennerring (3) liegende zweite Brennerring (4) der unteren Gasluftgemisch-Versorgungskammer (2) an seinem äußeren Durchmesser eine rundum spaltförmige Gasaustrittsöffnung (5) zur Auflage des Brennerkopfes (6) hin aufweist, der die Simmerflamme erzeugt, und die beiden Außendurchmesser der Brennerringe (3,4) im Flammenbereich die gleiche Größe aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/06; F24C 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19905198 A1 20000810; EP 1028286 A2 20000816; EP 1028286 A3 20010328; EP 1028286 B1 20040428; ES 2216405 T3 20041016; US 6263868 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC., WILMINGTON, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140107

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, SCHENECTADY, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140107

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC., WILMINGTON, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140107

2014-02-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CERAMASPEED INC., US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, SCHENECTADY, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC., WILMINGTON, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ HANNIG BORKOWSKI WISSGOTT, DE

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-04-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ HANNIG BORKOWSKI WISSGOTT, DE

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081021

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20081021

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2216405

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISPHORDING GERMANY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI