Global Patent Index - EP 1028286 A3

EP 1028286 A3 2001-03-28 - Cooking plate for gas ranges

Title (en)

Cooking plate for gas ranges

Title (de)

Kochstelle für Gasherde

Title (fr)

Plaque de cuisson pour cuisinières à gaz

Publication

EP 1028286 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99120745 A

Priority

DE 19905198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1028286A2] The burner is operated by a primary air mixture through two superposed gas air mixture supply chambers (1) which provide a main and preferably holding flame and an extremely low simmer flame through a gas input attached to the lower side of the burner head (6). The upper burner ring (3) of the upper gas air mixture supply chamber has on its outer diameter gas outlets (7) to produce the main and holding flame whilst the second burner ring (4) under the upper ring has on its outer diameter a split like circular gas outlet for the burner head producing the simmer flame. The two external diameters of the burner rings have the same size in the flame area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/06; F24C 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19905198 A1 20000810; EP 1028286 A2 20000816; EP 1028286 A3 20010328; EP 1028286 B1 20040428; ES 2216405 T3 20041016; US 6263868 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161017

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Representative's name: CASALONGA & PARTNERS, DE

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC., WILMINGTON, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, SCHENECTADY, N.Y., US

- Document: DE 59909326

2016-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2016-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Representative's name: CASALONGA & PARTNERS, DE

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CERAMASPEED INC., MARYVILLE, US

- Document: DE 59909326

- Effective date: 20140107

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, SCHENECTADY, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CERAMASPEED INC., MARYVILLE, TENN., US

- Document: DE 59909326

- Effective date: 20140107

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC., WILMINGTON, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CERAMASPEED INC., MARYVILLE, TENN., US

- Document: DE 59909326

- Effective date: 20140107

2014-02-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20131129

2014-02-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Representative's name: CASALONGA & PARTNERS, DE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

2013-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CERAMASPEED INC., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ISPHORDING GERMANY GMBH, 57439 ATTENDORN, DE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ISPHORDING GERMANY GMBH, 57439 ATTENDORN, DE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, SCHENECTADY, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ISPHORDING GERMANY GMBH, 57439 ATTENDORN, DE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAIER US APPLIANCE SOLUTIONS, INC., WILMINGTON, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ISPHORDING GERMANY GMBH, 57439 ATTENDORN, DE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ HANNIG BORKOWSKI WISSGOTT, DE

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-06-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Representative's name: CASALONGA & PARTNERS, DE

- Effective date: 20130429

2013-04-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909326

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ HANNIG BORKOWSKI WISSGOTT, DE

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081021

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081021

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216405 T3

2004-07-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909326 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISPHORDING GERMANY GMBH

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI