Global Patent Index - EP 1028287 A1

EP 1028287 A1 2000-08-16 - Atmospheric gas burner and gas distribution manifold for a gas burner

Title (en)

Atmospheric gas burner and gas distribution manifold for a gas burner

Title (de)

Atmosphärischer Gasbrenner sowie Gasverteilervorrichtung für einen Gasbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur atmosphérique à gaz et distributeur de gaz pour un brûleur à gaz

Publication

EP 1028287 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102842 A

Priority

DE 19905789 A

Abstract (en)

The atmospheric gas burner has a gas distributor (10) fitted with gas jets (16c). The separate gas jets have mixing pipes (20), aligned centrally with gaps, so that the gas flows from the jets draw combustion air into the mixing pipes (20), together with a system to set the primary air intake. The gaps are of different dimensions between the gas jets and the entry plane of the mixing pipe openings, pref. decreasing from the center of the gas distributor (10) to the outer ends, to set the primary air intake for the atmospheric gas burner.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen atmosphärischen Gasbrenner für ein Heizgerät mit einer mit Gasdüsen (16) ausgestatteten Gasverteilervorrichtung (10), sowie mit Mischrohren (20), die den einzelnen Gasdüsen (16) in einem Abstand zentral zugeordnet sind, so daß der aus den Gasdüsen (16) austretende Gasstrom unter Ansaugung von Verbrennungsluft in die Mischrohre (20) eintreten kann, sowie mit Mitteln zur Beeinflussung der Primärluftansaugung. Es wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Abstände n zwischen den Gasdüsen (16) und der Eintrittsebene der Mischrohröffnungen unterschiedlich groß ausgebildet sind. Dadurch wird auf einfache Art und Weise eine die Verbrennungsqualität begünstigende Beeinflussung der Primärluftansaugung für atmosphärische Gasbrenner bewirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/64; F23D 14/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/04 (2006.01); F23D 14/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/64 (2013.01); F23D 14/045 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14641 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028287 A1 20000816; DE 19905789 A1 20000824; DE 19905789 B4 20041104

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030902

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI