Global Patent Index - EP 1028288 A2

EP 1028288 A2 2000-08-16 - Method and device for operating a heating apparatus with flue gas discharge

Title (en)

Method and device for operating a heating apparatus with flue gas discharge

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Betreiben eines Heizgeräts mit einer Abgasabführung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour commander un appareil de chauffage avec une évacution des gaz de fumée

Publication

EP 1028288 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102743 A

Priority

DE 19905787 A

Abstract (en)

The burner for a heating system, with an exhaust gas outflow, has a control which keeps the burner (10) at a nominal temp. The control stops the burner (10) in a modulating power range, in a cycled pattern where the cycle ratio from the switch-on to the switch-off phases is set according to the sensitivity of the exhaust outflow to moisture by the parameters of the chimney such as its length, cross section shape and dimensions, and its thermal conductivity. The chimney also has an air opening (46) with a controlled air flap (48).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht auf von einem Verfahren und einer Vorrichtung zum Betreiben eines Heizgeräts mit einer Abgasabführung, einem Regler für eine Solltemperatur und einem Brenner, der innerhalb eines vorgegebenen Leistungsbereichs wärmebedarfsabhängig modulierend steuerbar ist. Es wird vorgeschlagen, daß der Regler den Brenner (10) im modulierenden Leistungsbereich getaktet unterbricht und das Taktverhältnis (v) von Einschaltphase zur Ausschaltphase auf die für die Feuchtigkeitsempfindlichkeit der Abgasabführung maßgebenden Parameter, (Länge, Querschnittsform und -größe, Wärmeleiteigenschaften insbes. eines Schornsteins) abgestimmt ist. Dadurch kann eine Durchfeuchtung des Schornsteins ohne merkliche Beeinträchtigung des Gerätewirkungsgrades und der Regelgüte verhindert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/00 (2006.01); F24H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/0036 (2013.01); F23N 1/002 (2013.01); F23J 2213/203 (2013.01); F23J 2900/15081 (2013.01); F23N 2027/10 (2013.01); F23N 2035/04 (2013.01); F23N 2035/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028288 A2 20000816; EP 1028288 A3 20020529; DE 19905787 A1 20000817; DE 19905787 B4 20050623

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-03-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23N 1/00 A, 7F 24H 9/00 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI