Global Patent Index - EP 1028289 A1

EP 1028289 A1 2000-08-16 - Temperature regulating device for baking oven having multiple heating systems

Title (en)

Temperature regulating device for baking oven having multiple heating systems

Title (de)

Temperatur-Regeleinrichtung für Backöfen mit mehreren Heizsystem

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage de température pour four de cuisson à plusieurs systèmes de chauffage

Publication

EP 1028289 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102675 A

Priority

EP 99102675 A

Abstract (en)

The temperature regulator has a temperature sensor in the oven chamber for specifying the actual temperature value for an electronic oven temperature regulator that receives different regulating parameters depending on the activated heating systems and/or combinations of heating systems for regulator adaptation. The sensor temperature gradients are detected (11) and compared (12) with stored gradients for the different heating systems and/or combinations to select (13) associated regulator parameters or sets of parameters.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Temperatur-Regeleinrichtung für Backöfen mit mehreren Heizsystemen vorgeschlagen, beispielsweise für Oberhitze, Unterhitze, Umluftbetrieb, Grill oder dergleichen. Ein Temperatursensor im Backofenraum dient zur Vorgabe des Temperatur-Istwerts für einen elektronischen Regler zur Regelung der Backofentemperatur auf vorgebbare Sollwerte, wobei dem Regler unterschiedliche Regelparameter in Abhängigkeit des jeweils eingeschalteten Heizsystems und/oder der jeweils eingeschalteten Kombination von Heizsystemen zur Regleranpassung zuführbar sind. Hierzu sind Mittel (11) zur Erfassung des Temperaturgradienten am Temperatursensor und zum Vergleich des erfaßten Temperaturgradienten mit den verschiedenen Heizsystemen und/oder Kombinationen von Heizsystemen zugeordneten gespeicherten Temperaturgradienten vorgesehen. Jedem gespeicherten Temperaturgradienten ist ein Reglerparameter oder ein Satz von Reglerparametern zugeordnet, wobei in Abhängigkeit des durch Vergleich ermittelten zugeordneten Temperaturgradienten der Regler mit dem entsprechenden Reglerparameter oder Satz von Reglerparametern beaufschlagbar ist. Hierdurch erfolgt eine automatische Anpassung des Temperaturreglers an das oder die jeweils eingeschalteten Heizsysteme ohne zusätzlichen Hardware-Aufwand. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4465228 A 19840814 - MORI KEIICHI [JP], et al
  • [A] EP 0579917 A2 19940126 - BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section EI Week 9748, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class X25, AN 97-518745, XP002109918
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 115 (M - 1224) 23 March 1992 (1992-03-23)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028289 A1 20000816; EP 1028289 B1 20020918; DE 59902739 D1 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140212

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150212

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150212

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902739

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902739

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140507

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902739 20021024

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990906

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI