Global Patent Index - EP 1028295 A2

EP 1028295 A2 2000-08-16 - Fan assembly

Title (en)

Fan assembly

Title (de)

Einbaugebläse

Title (fr)

Montage d'un ventilateur

Publication

EP 1028295 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890035 A

Priority

AT 19999 A

Abstract (en)

The blower (3) has an open housing (2), filter cover (4) with filter (6), and cover frame (5) with cover (7). Blower, filter cover, and cover frame form a pre-assembled modular unit (8), with blower and filter cover fastened to each other, and filter cover and frame connected so as to be detachable against spring force. The modular unit has spring lock elements (9) facing abutments (10) of the housing, to lock the unit in the housing. The filter cover contains a circuit box for electrical circuits and connections.

Abstract (de)

Ein Einbaugebläse (1) umfaßt ein vorderseitig offenes Gehäuse (2) zur Aufnahme des Gebläses (3) sowie eines Filterdeckels (4) und eines Abdeckrahmens (5), wobei auf den Filterdeckel (4) ein Filter (6) auflegbar und in den Abdeckrahmen (5) eine Abdeckplatte (7) einsteckbar ist. Um die Montage zu vereinfachen, bilden Gebläse (3), Filterdeckel (4) und Abdeckrahmen (5) eine vorgefertigte Einbaueinheit (8), in der das Gebläse (3) und der Filterdeckel (4) fest und der Filterdeckel (4) und der Abdeckrahmen (5) gegen Federkraft abhebbar miteinander verbunden sind, welche Einbaueinheit (8) Widerlagern (10) des Gehäuses (2) zugeordnete Federrasten (9) zum verrastenden Einsetzen in das Gehäuse (2) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 7/013; F04D 29/60; F04D 29/70; F24F 7/007

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/60 (2006.01); F04D 29/70 (2006.01); F24F 7/007 (2006.01); F24F 1/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/007 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0062 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0096 (2013.01); F24F 2221/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028295 A2 20000816; EP 1028295 A3 20050413; EP 1028295 B1 20060412; AT 410125 B 20030225; AT A19999 A 20020615; DE 50012547 D1 20060524; DK 1028295 T3 20060821; ES 2259991 T3 20061101; PT 1028295 E 20060731

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130210

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130812

2013-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130904

2013-10-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130210

2013-10-17 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20060402070

- Effective date: 20130904

2013-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LIMOT ELEKTROMOTORENBAUG.- M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-08-21 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130812

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111202

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20111128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080210

2009-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080210

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080211

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080211

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080210

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-10-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-09-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070115

2007-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-19 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20070219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-14 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-08 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-08 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-07 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070207

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2259991 T3

2006-08-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-08-03 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060402070

2006-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20060525

2006-07-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012547 P 20060524

2006-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-04-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060412

2006-01-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 7/013 A

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 7/007 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/60 B

2005-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/70 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI