Global Patent Index - EP 1028297 A3

EP 1028297 A3 2001-12-12 - Heat- and pump module

Title (en)

Heat- and pump module

Title (de)

Heiz- und Pumpmodul

Title (fr)

Module de chauffage et de pompage

Publication

EP 1028297 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102846 A

Priority

DE 29902488 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1028297A2] The heating and pumping module has a heat generator (9) with a heat container (37) and a pump (25) integrated into it. The heat generator is combined with the heat container and pump to form a compact unit. The pump can be arranged in the heat container or in a sealed pump container (41) with external suction and outlet connectors (29,28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] DE 29902504 U1 19990617 - KOBER AG [DE]
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 198621, Derwent World Patents Index; Class P13, AN 1986-136396, XP002180504

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028297 A2 20000816; EP 1028297 A3 20011212; DE 29902488 U1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI