Global Patent Index - EP 1028303 B1

EP 1028303 B1 2001-01-31 - Fin for heat exchanger

Title (en)

Fin for heat exchanger

Title (de)

Rippe für Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Ailette pour échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1028303 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102936 A

Priority

EP 99102936 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1028303A1] The ribs for a heat exchanger, as flat or corrugated ribs, have opening in one or more rows to take the heat exchanger tubes. Metal wires (7) are positioned at the edges of the strip material (5), drawn from supply bobbins (6) in a synchronized movement with the strip edge folding actions. The wires (7) are laid in the folded edges, and are cut with the finished ribs (10), to remain within their folded edges.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft Rippen für Wärmetauscher sowie ein Herstellungsverfahren für Rippen mit einer oder mehreren Reihen von Öffnungen, durch die sich die Rohre des Wärmetauschers erstrecken (Flachrippen) oder Wellrippen, die wellenförmig gefaltet und zwischen den Wärmetauscherrohren angeordnet sind, gegebenenfalls mit Lamellenschnitten zur Steigerung des Wärmetausches sowie mit umgelegtem Rand oder gegenüberliegenden umgelegten Rändern, der / die jeweils einen freien Querschnitt in sich einschließ/t/en. Um die Stabilität der Rippen zu erhöhen und die Maßabweichungen der Abstände zwischen den Öffnungen zu verringern wird erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß in dem freien Querschnitt des Randes (3) oder der gegenüberliegenden Ränder (3) ein metallisches Langmaterial (7) angeordnet ist. Das erfindungsgemäße Herstellungsverfahren sieht vor, daß synchron mit der Umlegung des/r Randes / Ränder (3) von einem Coil (6) ein Draht (7) abgespult und in den/die umzulegenden Rand/Ränder (3) eingeführt wird, daß die Drähte (7) gemeinsam mit den fertigen Rippen (10) abgeschnitten werden und in den/m umgelegten Rändern/Rand (3) der Rippen (10) verbleiben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/32; B21D 53/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 49/00 (2006.01); B21F 15/10 (2006.01); F28F 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 49/00 (2013.01); B21F 15/10 (2013.01); F28F 1/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028303 A1 20000816; EP 1028303 B1 20010131; AT 199041 T 20010215; DE 59900039 D1 20010308; ES 2154499 T3 20010401

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080214

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080213

2009-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080214

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080213

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080213

2008-09-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: NEDERLANDSE *RADIATEUREN FABRIEK B.V.

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070207

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154499 T3

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-03-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900039 20010308

2001-03-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199041 T 20010215

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991022

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI