Global Patent Index - EP 1028356 A2

EP 1028356 A2 2000-08-16 - Device for humidifying a material in web form

Title (en)

Device for humidifying a material in web form

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Befeuchten von bahnförmigem Material

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour humidifier un matériau en forme de bande

Publication

EP 1028356 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124298 A

Priority

DE 19905824 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has an inlet opening (26) and an outlet opening (24) for the strip material (28,30) and an application device between the openings. The openings are arranged between at least two moistening arms (16,18) and are connected together via a groove (32) running between the openings and open at the edge. An Independent claim is also included for an application of the arrangement to a digital printer in connection with a fixer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Befeuchten von bahnförmigem Material, wobei die Befeuchtungsvorrichtung als mobiles Einsatzgerät ausgebildet ist und das bahnförmige Material seitlich in die Befeuchtungsvorrichtung einschiebbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/02; B65H 23/00; B65H 37/00; G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/02 (2006.01); B65H 23/00 (2006.01); B65H 37/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/6573 (2013.01); B41F 23/02 (2013.01); B65H 23/00 (2013.01); B65H 37/00 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5142 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00455 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028356 A2 20000816; EP 1028356 A3 20011121; EP 1028356 B1 20040707; DE 19905824 A1 20000907; JP 2000233490 A 20000829; US 6352590 B1 20020305

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909905

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-01-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909905 P 20040812

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-07-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-07-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 23/02 A

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 23/00 B

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 37/00 B

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 03G 15/00 B

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031127

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 03G 15/00 A, 7B 41F 23/02 B, 7B 65H 23/00 B, 7B 65H 37/00 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI