Global Patent Index - EP 1028400 A2

EP 1028400 A2 2000-08-16 - Extraction mechanism for automatic vending machines

Title (en)

Extraction mechanism for automatic vending machines

Title (de)

Ausgabemechanismus für Verkaufsautomaten

Title (fr)

Mécanisme d'extraction pour machines automatiques de vente

Publication

EP 1028400 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500019 A

Priority

  • ES 9900290 A
  • ES 200000259 A

Abstract (en)

The e.g. cans are stacked in a horizontal position in two columns which are contained by two parallel walls (1, 2), with the extraction mechanism consisting of a retainer (4) element on which rests the lowermost can (3). Retainer (4) consists of one or more approximately semicircular elements which may revolve about their axes (5) and are placed so that a curved segment (6) together with the lower edge (7) of the opposing wall defines a gap narrower than the diameter of cans, while the straight segment (8) defines an outlet gap slightly larger than the diameter so that the can may be released. -

Extraction mechanism for automatic vending machines, particularly for machines which sell products contained in cylindrical or prismatic containers (3) stacked in a horizontal position arranged in quincunxes and forming two columns which are contained by two parallel walls (1, 2), with the extraction mechanism consisting of a retainer (4) element on which rests the lowermost container (3). Retainer (4) consists of at least one approximately semicircular element which may revolve about its axis (5) and placed such that its curved segment (6) together with the lower edge (7) of the opposing wall defines a gap narrower than the diameter of containers (3'), while the straight segment (8) defines an outlet gap slightly larger than said diameter so that container (3') may be let out. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 11/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/08 (2006.01); G07F 11/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/24 (2013.01); G07F 11/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028400 A2 20000816; EP 1028400 A3 20010314; EP 1028400 B1 20080723; DE 60039548 D1 20080904; ES 2308968 T3 20081216

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170202

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AZKOYEN, S.A., PERALTA, ES

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AZKOYEN INDUSTRIAL S.A., PERALTA, NAVARRA, ES

- Document: DE 60039548

- Effective date: 20120420

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AZKOYEN, S.A., ES

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AZKOYEN INDUSTRIAL S.A., PERALTA, ES

- Document: DE 60039548

- Effective date: 20120420

2012-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60039548

- Representative's name: GIHSKE GROSSE KLUEPPEL KROSS BUEROGEMEINSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20120420

2012-04-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60039548

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE VALENTIN, GIHSKE, GROSSE, KLUEP, DE

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090212

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090212

2009-07-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090424

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081223

2008-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2308968 T3

2008-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60039548 P 20080904

2008-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT

2008-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOPEZ RUIZ, JOSE MARIA

2007-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061109

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT PT

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07F 11/24 A, 7G 07F 11/08 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI