Global patent index - EP 1028407 A3

EP 1028407 A3 2000-12-06 - Advertising support

Title (en)

Advertising support

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme einer Werbeinformation

Title (fr)

Support de publicité

Publication

EP 1028407 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00101761 A

Priority

DE 29902283 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1028407A2] The panels forming the sides of the stand are stamped and punched pieces of sheet metal with flanges (2) extending inwards towards the center of the stand. Opposing panels are joined together with their flanges in contact with each other. Several panels (1), preferably three, are joined together to form the stand.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 1/10 (2006.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0068 (2013.01); G09F 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902283 U1 19990520; EP 1028407 A2 20000816; EP 1028407 A3 20001206

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI