Global Patent Index - EP 1028435 A3

EP 1028435 A3 2001-02-07 - Data cable

Title (en)

Data cable

Title (de)

Datenkabel

Title (fr)

Câble de données

Publication

EP 1028435 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102841 A

Priority

DE 19905930 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1028435A2] The data cable has two cable elements that are twisted together and enclosed by a common screen as a twisted cable pair (3). The common screen (4) contains a metal-coated polymer foil, can be at least partly extruded from a conductive material and can contain an electrolytically applied metal coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028435 A2 20000816; EP 1028435 A3 20010207; DE 19905930 A1 20000817

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060901

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI