Global patent index - EP 1028437 A1

EP 1028437 A1 2000-08-16 - HIGH CORROSION-RESISTANT R-Fe-B-BASE BONDED MAGNET AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (en)

HIGH CORROSION-RESISTANT R-Fe-B-BASE BONDED MAGNET AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (de)

KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGE R-FE-B VERBUNDMAGNET UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

AIMANT LIE A BASE DE R-Fe-B EXTREMEMENT RESISTANT A LA CORROSION ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT AIMANT

Publication

EP 1028437 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950380 A

Priority

  • JP 9804829 W
  • JP 31643597 A
  • JP 33368197 A
  • JP 4455898 A
  • JP 4455998 A
  • JP 4882798 A
  • JP 4882898 A
  • JP 5604498 A
  • JP 8301198 A
  • JP 8301298 A
  • JP 10349698 A

Abstract (en)

A method of efficiently manufacturing R-Fe-B-base bonded magnets of various shapes such as ring shape and disk shape having a high corrosion resistance and capable of being plated electrically with ease, wherein the corrosion resistance of the magnet is improved by forming a conductive film of a metal on the surface thereof with tight adhesion, uniformity and efficiency. The method comprises filling the holes of the magnet with polishing powder, inorganic powder and polishing chips, fixing these materials in the holes by fat of a vegetable medium and sealing the resultant holes, and barrel-polishing the magnet by a barrel unit in the dry process with indefinitely shaped, i.e. spherical, massive or acicular (wiry) pieces of a required size of Cu, Sn, Zn, Pb, Cd, In, Au, Ag, Fe, Ni, Co, Cr and Al and such pieces of alloys thereof used as a metallic medium. Said fine pieces of metals such as Cu are press fitted into a resin surface and holes of the bonded magnet and cover the surface and holes and further, cover the surfaces of particles of magnetic powder whereby a very uniform conductive film can be formed on the surface of the bonded magnet, so that it becomes possible to subject the bonded magnet to electric plating excellently and obtain a plated R-Fe-B-base bonded magnet of a high corrosion resistance and with minimum deterioration of the magnetic properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/56 (2006.01); C25D 5/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/562 (2013.01); C25D 5/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028437 A1 20000816; EP 1028437 A4 20010613; EP 1028437 B1 20060517; CN 1205626 C 20050608; CN 1279810 A 20010110; DE 69834567 D1 20060622; DE 69834567 T2 20070426; KR 100374398 B1 20030304; WO 9923675 A1 19990514

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070220

2006-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69834567

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-06-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2006-05-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-05-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2004-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEOMAX CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-06-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01F 7/02 A, 7H 01F 41/02 B, 7H 01F 1/057 B

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL