Global Patent Index - EP 1028442 A1

EP 1028442 A1 2000-08-16 - Anti-theft electric switch for a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Anti-theft electric switch for a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Diebstahlsicherer elektrischer Schalter für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Commutateur électrique d'antivol de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1028442 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400260 A

Priority

FR 9901686 A

Abstract (en)

The self cleaning switch mechanism has a rotor (12) contacting a fixed stator section. The stator element has a fixed section (38) holding a flexible contact strip (124) and contact section (56). The rotor has a protruding cam section (114) which during part of the starter switch sequence deforms the contact strip section providing a contact cleaning sequence.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention propose un commutateur électrique rotatif pour un antivol de véhicule automobile, du type comportant un rotor (12) qui est monté à rotation par rapport à un stator (14) pour provoquer l'alimentation électrique d'un démarreur, au moyen d'au moins un contact électrique à lame (44), caractérisé en ce que le rotor comporte une surface de came (114, 116) de nettoyage du contact électrique (36, 40, 44, 56) qui coopère avec une portion en vis-à-vis (124) du tronçon intermédiaire (110) d'une lame de contact (44) pour déformer élastiquement la lame de contact (44), globalement dans son plan axial moyen, et provoquer un déplacement relatif de l'extrémité libre inférieure (56) du tronçon mobile (52) par rapport à la portion de contact (40) de l'élément fixe de contact (36), avec laquelle elle est en contact, lorsque le rotor (12) provoque la fermeture ou l'ouverture du contact électrique (36, 40, 44, 56). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/18; H01H 19/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/18 (2006.01); H01H 19/63 (2006.01); H01H 19/62 (2006.01); H01H 27/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/18 (2013.01); H01H 19/63 (2013.01); H01H 19/62 (2013.01); H01H 27/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028442 A1 20000816; EP 1028442 B1 20060809; AR 022574 A1 20020904; BR 0000368 A 20000926; DE 60029853 D1 20060921; DE 60029853 T2 20070830; ES 2269073 T3 20070401; FR 2789797 A1 20000818; FR 2789797 B1 20010601; MX PA00001615 A 20020308; US 6143994 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150327

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60029853

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60029853

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130110

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269073 T3

2006-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060904

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60029853 P 20060921

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2006-08-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE S.A.S.

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI