Global Patent Index - EP 1028486 A2

EP 1028486 A2 2000-08-16 - Electrical connector terminal

Title (en)

Electrical connector terminal

Title (de)

Elektrische Verbinderklemme

Title (fr)

Borne de connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1028486 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00102789 A

Priority

JP 3212899 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical connector terminal comprises a connection member (10) having a connection section (11) to be crimped to core wires (C1), a mating member (20) having a mating section (22) to be mated with the contact element of a mating connector, and a linking section (30) for integrating the connection and mating members (10, 20). The mating member (20) is made from a springy material while the connection member (10) is made from a material which is softer than the above material for the mating member (20) and easy to make plastic deformation for crimping connection. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 11/11 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01); H01R 4/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/183 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028486 A2 20000816; EP 1028486 A3 20020130; JP 2000231951 A 20000822

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 4/18 A, 7H 01R 4/62 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI