Global Patent Index - EP 1028487 A1

EP 1028487 A1 2000-08-16 - Electrical contact with wire nut

Title (en)

Electrical contact with wire nut

Title (de)

Elektrischer Kontakt mit Aderhülse

Title (fr)

Contact électrique avec connexion à visser

Publication

EP 1028487 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00102708 A

Priority

US 24876199 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical contact has an electrical contact engaging end portion, an intermediate portion and a wire nut end portion that mechanically and electrically engages an electrical conductor. The three portions are electrically connected together. The wire nut portion can be integrally formed with the contact or can be a helix inserted into a barrel formed on the contact. In one embodiment the intermediate portion is omitted with the electrical contact engaging end portion transitioning directly into the wire nut portion. The electrical contact engaging end portion can be a pin contact, a socket contact, a genderless contact, a lug contact and the like. In another embodiment, the electrical contact includes an integrally formed spring portion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01); H01R 4/22 (2006.01); H01R 11/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028487 A1 20000816; AU 1529800 A 20000817; BR 0000373 A 20011009; JP 2000277191 A 20001006

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-14 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032298

2003-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020827

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020215

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI