Global patent index - EP 1028492 A1

EP 1028492 A1 2000-08-16 - Connecting element

Title (en)

Connecting element

Title (de)

Verbindungselement

Title (fr)

Elément de connexion

Publication

EP 1028492 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102584 A

Priority

DE 19905717 A

Abstract (en)

The connecting element (10) is formed as a single-piece stanced metal part, and comprises at least one clamping reception (14) connected with at least one conductor (60) for an electric component (12), as well as at least one carrier section (16) for the clamping reception. The distance between each other facing interiors of clamping arms forming the clamping reception is smaller in the area of a common base section than in a reception area lying close to the free ends of the clamping arms. An Independent claim is provided for a corresponding manufacturing method for a connecting element.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verbindungselement zur Herstellung von elektrischen Verbindungen zwischen elektrischen Bauteilen, insbesondere Relais oder Sicherungen, und Anschlußleitungen in Kraftfahrzeugen, das als einstückiges Stanz-/Biegeteil ausgebildet ist und wenigstens eine Klemmaufnahme für ein elektrisches Bauteil sowie wenigstens einen mit zumindest einer Anschlußleitung verbindbaren Trägerabschnitt für die Klemmaufnahme umfaßt, wobei der Abstand zwischen den einander zugewandten Innenseiten von die Klemmaufnahme bildenden Klemmarmen im Bereich eines gemeinsamen Basisabschnitts Meiner ist als in einem näher an den freien Enden der Klemmarme gelegenen Aufnahmebereich. Die Erfindung betrifft außerdem eine Verbindungsanordnung aus einem derartigen Verbindungselement und einem Anschlußelement sowie ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer derartigen Verbindungsanordnung. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/115; H01R 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/20 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/2035 (2013.01); H01R 13/11 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01); H01H 2085/2085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028492 A1 20000816; DE 19905717 A1 20000817

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100101

2007-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070625

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001229

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI