Global Patent Index - EP 1028494 A2

EP 1028494 A2 2000-08-16 - Lever-operated connector assembly with two complementary connectors

Title (en)

Lever-operated connector assembly with two complementary connectors

Title (de)

Hebelbetätigte Verbindungsanordnung mit zwei komplementären Verbindern

Title (fr)

Ensemble de connecteur actionné par levier avec deux connecteurs complémentaires

Publication

EP 1028494 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00102759 A

Priority

EP 99102686 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to an electric connector assembly (1) with two complementary connectors (2, 3) of which the first (2) comprises a socket (4) for receiving the second connector (3) and the second connector (3) comprises a pivotal lever (24) with a guide groove (27) which interacts with a guide peg (13) provided in the socket in such a way that the two connectors can be partially plugged when the lever is located in an entry position in which the guide peg can be inserted into the guide groove and in such a way that, owing to the operation of the lever, the guide peg moves along the guide grooves and the complementary connectors are completely plugged, wherein a second groove (28) is provided on the pivotal lever, and a second peg (14) is provided in the socket and wherein, on operation of the lever, the peg initially moves freely in the groove and groove and peg interact as from a specific lever position and the two connectors are plugged with restricted guidance. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/62938 (2013.01); H01R 13/62955 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028494 A2 20000816; EP 1028494 A3 20010117; EP 1028494 B1 20050427; JP 2000243513 A 20000908

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60019659 P 20050602

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021111

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI