Global patent index - EP 1028497 A2

EP 1028497 A2 2000-08-16 - Planar filter

Title (en)

Planar filter

Title (de)

Planarfilter

Title (fr)

Filtre planaire

Publication

EP 1028497 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125868 A

Priority

DE 29902505 U

Abstract (en)

A monolithic planar filter comprises a high dielectric constant support (1) with an earth electrode coating on one face and insular signal electrode regions (3) on the other face. A planar filter, for plug connectors with rows of spaced signal connector pins, has a support with corresponding pin-receiving openings (2) and adjacent capacitors, each having a dielectric layer between a first coating, connected to the associated signal line, and a second coating for connection to earth. The filter has a monolithic structure, in which: (a) the support (1) forms the dielectric and comprises a molded, perforated, sintered and ground high dielectric constant material block, onto which the capacitor electrodes are applied; (b) the earth electrode completely covers one face of the support except for the pin openings and their immediate surroundings; and (c) the signal electrodes (3) form insular regions which extend from the signal pins to the support edge on the other side face of the support.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einem Planarfilter mit vielen, durch einen Träger (1) geführten Signalstiften, von denen jeder einen Kondensator aufweist, mit einem mit dem Signalstift verbundenen Signalbelag (3), einem mit Masse verbundenen Massebelag (4) sowie einer beide trennenden dielektrischen Schicht, Störkapazitäten zwischen den Signalelektroden zu unterdrücken, wird es monolithisch aufgebaut. Auf den das Dielektricum bildende, aus einer Masse höherer Dielektrizitätskonstante als Block geformte und nach Formung und Lochung gesinterte und geschliffene Träger (1) sind die Elektroden der Kondensatoren aufgebracht, wobei die Masseelektrode (4) die eine der Seitenflächen des Trägers (1), abgesehen von den Stiftdurchführungen (2) der Signalstifte und deren Umgebung, ganzflächig überdeckt, und wobei die Signalelektroden (3) auf der anderen Seitenfläche des Trägers (1) von den Stiftdurchführungen (2) der Signalstifte ausgehende, sich zum Rand des Trägers (1) hin erstreckende, inselförmige Bereiche bilden. Dieses Planarfilter wird vorteilhaft mit einer Stützplatte versehen beispielsweise in auf Platinen aufgelöteten Steckverbindern eingesetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/719

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/719 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/7195 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902505 U1 20000323; CA 2293131 A1 20000802; CA 2293131 C 20080318; EP 1028497 A2 20000816; EP 1028497 A3 20010808; EP 1028497 B1 20041110

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151224

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151224

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59911042

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141205

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-10-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-02-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050210

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911042

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040205

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK FR GB

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI