Global patent index - EP 1028501 A1

EP 1028501 A1 2000-08-16 - Device for feeding cable ends to a cable harness assembly apparatus

Title (en)

Device for feeding cable ends to a cable harness assembly apparatus

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Zubringung von Kabelenden zu Konfektioniereinheiten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport d'extrémités de câble pour une unité de confection de câbles

Publication

EP 1028501 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00102369 A

Priority

  • EP 00102369 A
  • EP 99810132 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a delivery device that simultaneously delivers at least two cable ends (25,26) for processing by a prefabricating unit. The delivery device has drive units (2,3) for delivering the cable ends and grippers (4,5) for holding the cable ends. Common drive units are used for linear and rotational movement of the grippers.

Abstract (de)

Dieser Kabelzubringer (1) besteht im wesentlichen aus einer ersten Antriebseinheit (2), einer zweiten Antriebseinheit (3), einer dritten Antriebseinheit und aus Greifern (4,5). Die erste Antriebseinheit (2) weist eine um einen dritten Drehpunkt (6) drehbare Plattform (7) auf, die über einen Riemen (8) mittels eines Motors (9) angetrieben ist. Die zweite Antriebseinheit (3) ist von der Plattform (7) getragen und auf dieser mittels dritter Antriebseinheit in der Richtung einer Achse (10) verschiebbar angeordnet. Die Greifer (4,5) mit den Kabelenden (25,26) sind im Arbeitsbereich eines Abisolierautomaten (45) gezeigt, wobei die zweite Antriebseinheit (3) so angesteuert ist, dass beide Kabelachsen (27,28) parallel verlaufen und die Kabelenden (25,26) gleichzeitig abisoliert werden. Danach wird die zweite Antriebseinheit (3) mit den Greifern (4,5) in der Richtung der Achse (10) mittels dritter Antriebseinheit rückwärts verschoben und in den Arbeitsbereich des nachfolgenden Automaten (46) zur Bestückung von Dichtungstüllen geschwenkt. Nach dieser Operation werden die Kabelenden (25,26) in den Arbeitsbereich eines Crimpautomaten (47) gebracht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/052

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/052 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028501 A1 20000816; EP 1028501 B1 20030423

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150302

2015-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20151030

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100204

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ING. HANS LUDESCHER, PATENTABTEILUNG DER SFS GRUPP

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50001827

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI