Global Patent Index - EP 1028550 A1

EP 1028550 A1 2000-08-16 - OPTICAL SWITCH

Title (en)

OPTICAL SWITCH

Title (de)

OPTISCHER SCHALTER

Title (fr)

COMMUTATEUR OPTIQUE

Publication

EP 1028550 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99940561 A

Priority

  • JP 9904682 W
  • JP 24579598 A

Abstract (en)

An optical switching system is implemented by providing a transmitting section with a preparatory transmitted optical signal selector and a working transmitted optical signal splitter, which are each implemented by a 1x2 optical space switch, and by providing a receiving section with a receiving optical switch which is implemented by a 2x2 optical space switch, and with a preparatory receiving optical gate which is implemented by a 1x2 optical space switch. This makes it possible to switch between the working system and preparatory system without employing any 4x4 optical space switch, thereby implementing a practical optical switching system without causing such problems as communication interruption during maintenance or impairment of transmission path working efficiency. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 11/00; H04B 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/03 (2013.01); H04B 10/032 (2013.01); H04B 10/27 (2013.01); H04B 10/275 (2013.01); H04B 10/29 (2013.01); H04Q 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04J 14/0297 (2013.01); H04J 14/0283 (2013.01); H04J 14/0291 (2013.01); H04J 14/0294 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0005 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0062 (2013.01); H04Q 2011/0024 (2013.01); H04Q 2011/0043 (2013.01); H04Q 2011/0081 (2013.01); H04Q 2011/0092 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1028550 A1 20000816; EP 1028550 A4 20040908; EP 1028550 B1 20100811; DE 69942662 D1 20100923; EP 1926342 A2 20080528; EP 1926342 A3 20081126; JP 2000078080 A 20000314; JP 3553385 B2 20040811; US 6434288 B1 20020813; WO 0013347 A1 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140830

2015-06-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69942662

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140830

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69942662

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130808

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130829

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69942662

- Effective date: 20110512

2011-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110512

2010-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69942662 P 20100923

2010-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070830

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KDD CORPORATION

2004-09-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040727

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04Q 11/00 A

2004-05-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 10/00 B

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE